NJ S1833 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1385
Note: Carry Foward to future S970
Note: Carry Over of previous S1457
Note: Carry Foward to future S970
Note: Carry Over of previous S1457
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires members of governing boards of public institutions of higher education to complete a training program developed by Secretary on Higher Education.
Title
Requires members of governing boards of public institutions of higher education to complete a training program developed by Secretary on Higher Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1833 (Carry Over) 2019-06-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S1833 (Carry Over) 2019-06-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S1457 (Carry Over) 2016-02-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
S1833 (Carry Over) 2019-06-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S1457 (Carry Over) 2016-02-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee