NJ S1840 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1254
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Substituted by A2041 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Substituted by A2041 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Economic Redevelopment and Growth Grant Bond Financing Act," authorizing issuance of bonds secured by pledge of Economic Redevelopment and Growth Grant proceeds, municipal liens, and special assessment; expands "Redevelopment Area Bond Financing Law;" extends time to complete certain projects under "Long Term Tax Exemption Law."
Title
Establishes "Economic Redevelopment and Growth Grant Bond Financing Act," authorizing issuance of bonds secured by pledge of Economic Redevelopment and Growth Grant proceeds, municipal liens, and special assessment; expands "Redevelopment Area Bond Financing Law;" extends time to complete certain projects under "Long Term Tax Exemption Law."
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Chris Brown [R] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | Senate | Substituted by A2041 (2R) |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1254 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
A2041 (Same As) 2018-08-17 - Approved P.L.2018, c.97.
A2041 (Same As) 2018-08-17 - Approved P.L.2018, c.97.