NJ S1852 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1535
Note: Carry Over of previous S1957
Note: Carry Over of previous S1957
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A5511 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A5511 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises certain penalties for illegal operation of snowmobile, all-terrain vehicle, or dirt bike.*
Title
Revises certain penalties for illegal operation of snowmobile, all-terrain vehicle, or dirt bike.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Substituted by A5511 (2R) |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1852 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A5511 (2R)
S1957 (Carry Over) 2016-03-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A5511 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.505.
S1957 (Carry Over) 2016-03-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A5511 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.505.