NJ S1857 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A562
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Approved P.L.2019, c.78.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Approved P.L.2019, c.78.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Designates Thomas Alva Edison as State Inventor.
Title
Designates Thomas Alva Edison as State Inventor.
Sponsors
Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] |
Rep. Robert Karabinchak [D] | Rep. Jamel Holley [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3238 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.78. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0) |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Substituted for A3238 |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-11-26 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2018-10-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2018-10-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3238 (Same As) 2019-02-25 - Substituted by S1857
A562 (Carry Over) 2017-12-04 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A562 (Carry Over) 2017-12-04 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading