NJ S1887 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A2190

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Approved P.L.2019, c.252.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Directs Commissioner of Labor and Workforce Development to establish pilot program to assist certain unemployed and underemployed individuals to complete industry-valued Credentials in 12 months. *

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs Commissioner of Labor and Workforce Development to establish pilot program to assist certain unemployed and underemployed individuals to complete industry-valued Credentials in 12 months. *

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in House Amendments (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4164 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-23AssemblyApproved P.L.2019, c.252.
2019-06-27AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0)
2019-06-13AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-06-10SenateConcur by Senate Amendments (36-0) (Greenstein)
2019-05-24SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-05-23AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (75-0-0)
2019-05-23AssemblySubstituted for A4164 (2R)
2019-05-20AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-10-18AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-10-15AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
2018-09-27SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2018-05-21SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2190 (Carry Over) 2016-12-05 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A4164 (Same As) 2019-05-23 - Substituted by S1887 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback