NJ S19 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-4)
Status: Passed on September 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-10 - Approved P.L.2020, c.76.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-4)
Status: Passed on September 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-10 - Approved P.L.2020, c.76.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Designates, as State and public holiday, third Friday in June as Juneteenth Day.
Title
Designates, as State and public holiday, third Friday in June as Juneteenth Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4315 (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4315 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-27 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4315 (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4315 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-27 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-10 | Senate | Approved P.L.2020, c.76. |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-3) |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (62-0-12) |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Substituted for A4315 |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-07-02 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
A4315 (Same As) 2020-07-30 - Substituted by S19 (1R)