NJ S1906 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3123
Note: Carry Over of previous S1757
Note: Carry Over of previous S1757
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-18 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-18 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows veteran or personal representative to withdraw honorable discharge papers from county clerk.
Title
Allows veteran or personal representative to withdraw honorable discharge papers from county clerk.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1906 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S1757 (Carry Over) 2016-03-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A3665 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S1757 (Carry Over) 2016-03-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A3665 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee