NJ S1957 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1147
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on December 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-14 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-14 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Supports activities of New Jersey Manufacturing Extension Program, Inc.
Title
Supports activities of New Jersey Manufacturing Extension Program, Inc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3756 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-14 | Senate | Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate |
2020-10-29 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-0-0) |
2020-10-29 | Assembly | Substituted for A3756 |
2020-10-29 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-0) |
2020-08-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1957 (Carry Over) 2020-12-14 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
A3756 (Same As) 2020-10-29 - Substituted by S1957
A3756 (Same As) 2020-10-29 - Substituted by S1957