NJ S1958 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on December 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-17 - Approved P.L.2018, c.147.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on December 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-17 - Approved P.L.2018, c.147.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes permit to allow seasonal retail consumption license holders to sell alcoholic beverages during certain off-season dates.*
Title
Establishes permit to allow seasonal retail consumption license holders to sell alcoholic beverages during certain off-season dates.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3609 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Senate Substitute (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3609 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Senate Substitute (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-17 | Senate | Approved P.L.2018, c.147. |
2018-10-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (26-12) |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2018-09-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (55-23-0) |
2018-09-27 | Assembly | Substituted for A3609 (ACS) |
2018-09-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-09-13 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (26-12) |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Senate Substitution (22-5) (Gopal) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3609 (Same As) 2018-09-27 - Substituted by S1958 (SS/1R)