NJ S1967 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S2148

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 25 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - 2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (30-3)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Concerns certain workers' compensation supplemental benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerns certain workers' compensation supplemental benefits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3635 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 7 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13Senate2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (30-3)
2019-05-13SenateConditional Veto, Received in the Senate
2019-02-25AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (65-7-2)
2019-02-25AssemblySubstituted for A3635 (1R)
2019-01-28AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-01-28AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-11-26AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
2018-10-29SenatePassed by the Senate (26-12)
2018-10-15SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-09-13SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-09-13SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-22SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2148 (Carry Over) 2016-05-02 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
A3635 (Same As) 2019-02-25 - Substituted by S1967 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback