NJ S1974 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Approved P.L.2018, c.66.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Approved P.L.2018, c.66.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires petitions of nomination of candidates for State, county, school, or municipal elective public office to include functioning e-mail addresses therefor.
Title
Requires petitions of nomination of candidates for State, county, school, or municipal elective public office to include functioning e-mail addresses therefor.
Sponsors
Sen. James Beach [D] | Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] | Sen. Andrew Zwicker [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] |
Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Nicholas Chiaravalloti [D] | Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3461 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-20 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2018, c.66. |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (69-2-0) |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Substituted for A3461 |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (30-8) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3461 (Same As) 2018-06-07 - Substituted by S1974