NJ S2 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-24 - Approved P.L.2018, c.67.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-24 - Approved P.L.2018, c.67.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Modifies school funding law to eliminate adjustment aid and State aid growth limit; allows adjustment to tax levy growth limitation for certain school districts.
Title
Modifies school funding law to eliminate adjustment aid and State aid growth limit; allows adjustment to tax levy growth limitation for certain school districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Table Motion (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 44 N: 28 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 17 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Table Motion (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 44 N: 28 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 17 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-24 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2018, c.67. |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (54-17-4) |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Motion To Table (Greenwald) (44-28-0) |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Motion To Aa (DiMaso) |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Substituted for A2 (1R) |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (25-13) |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Motion To Table (22-15) (Weinberg) |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Motion To Sa (Pennacchio) |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2 (Same As) 2018-06-21 - Substituted by S2 (1R)