NJ S20 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-29 - Substituted by A3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-29 - Substituted by A3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends and supplements FY20 appropriations act to effectuate extension of fiscal year through September 30, 2020; reduces authorized appropriations; makes FY20 supplemental appropriations of $7,745,997,000 in State funds and $4,586,243,000 in federal funds.
Title
Amends and supplements FY20 appropriations act to effectuate extension of fiscal year through September 30, 2020; reduces authorized appropriations; makes FY20 supplemental appropriations of $7,745,997,000 in State funds and $4,586,243,000 in federal funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Senate | Substituted by A3 |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3 (Same As) 2020-06-30 - Approved P.L.2020, c.43.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S20 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S0500/20_I1.PDF |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S20 |