NJ S2015 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A495
Note: Carry Over of previous A3546
Note: Carry Over of previous A3546
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates exemption from certain MVC fees for prisoners of war.
Title
Creates exemption from certain MVC fees for prisoners of war.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2015 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A306 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A3546 (Carry Over) 2016-06-06 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A306 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A3546 (Carry Over) 2016-06-06 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee