NJ S2046 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S2214

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Approved P.L.2019, c.201.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Requires institutions of higher education and proprietary degree-granting institutions to improve transparency of tuition and fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires institutions of higher education and proprietary degree-granting institutions to improve transparency of tuition and fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3625 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-30AssemblyApproved P.L.2019, c.201.
2019-06-20AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0)
2019-06-20AssemblySubstituted for A3625
2018-09-13AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-11AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
2018-06-07SenatePassed by the Senate (37-0)
2018-05-14SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-26SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2214 (Carry Over) 2017-12-20 - Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend.
A3625 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S2046

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback