NJ S2057 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1760
Note: Carry Foward to future A3695
Note: Carry Over of previous S2396
Note: Carry Foward to future A3695
Note: Carry Over of previous S2396
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-20 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-20 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DMVA notify certain veteran organizations and county officers of names of persons buried or cremated in State veteran cemeteries.
Title
Requires DMVA notify certain veteran organizations and county officers of names of persons buried or cremated in State veteran cemeteries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-20 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2057 (Carry Over) 2020-08-20 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2057 (Carry Over) 2020-08-20 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A3566 (Same As) 2020-10-08 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2396 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2057 (Carry Over) 2020-08-20 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A3566 (Same As) 2020-10-08 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2396 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading