NJ S2085 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-16 - Approved P.L.2020, c.59.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-16 - Approved P.L.2020, c.59.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
"Electronic Construction Procurement Act."
Title
"Electronic Construction Procurement Act."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3785 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3785 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-16 | Senate | Approved P.L.2020, c.59. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-1) |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0) |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Substituted for A3785 (1R) |
2020-06-25 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-25 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3785 (Same As) 2020-06-29 - Substituted by S2085 (1R)