NJ S2098 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1642
Note: Carry Foward to future S845
Note: Carry Over of previous S285
Note: Carry Over of previous A624
Note: Carry Foward to future S845
Note: Carry Over of previous S285
Note: Carry Over of previous A624
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on August 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-14 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-14 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Restricts phosphorus content and requires labelling thereof for household cleansing products.
Title
Restricts phosphorus content and requires labelling thereof for household cleansing products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-14 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2020-08-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2098 (Carry Over) 2020-09-14 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S2098 (Carry Over) 2020-09-14 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
A460 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S285 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A624 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S2098 (Carry Over) 2020-09-14 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
A460 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S285 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A624 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee