NJ S2127 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Substituted by A2787 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Substituted by A2787 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends pilot program authorizing special occasion events at wineries on preserved farmland; implements reporting requirement.
Title
Extends pilot program authorizing special occasion events at wineries on preserved farmland; implements reporting requirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | Substituted by A2787 (1R) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2787 (Same As) 2018-05-30 - Approved P.L.2018, c.30.