NJ S2129 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-16-1)
Status: Enrolled on January 31 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directs certain unclaimed electric and gas utility deposits in Unclaimed Utility Deposits Trust Fund and societal charge revenues to be paid to Statewide nonprofit energy assistance organizations designated by BPU.**

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs certain unclaimed electric and gas utility deposits in Unclaimed Utility Deposits Trust Fund and societal charge revenues to be paid to Statewide nonprofit energy assistance organizations designated by BPU.**

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3096 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-20 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16SenateReceived in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend.
2019-05-13AssemblyPassed by the Senate (34-1)
2019-03-25Assembly2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (38-0)
2019-03-18AssemblyConditional Veto, Received in the Senate
2019-01-31SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-0)
2019-01-31SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-01-31AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (73-0-3)
2019-01-31AssemblySubstituted for A3096/4049 (ACS/1R)
2019-01-28AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-09-24AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-06-21AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
2018-06-21SenatePassed by the Senate (37-2)
2018-06-18SenateReported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2018-06-14SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-06-14SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-03-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3096 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Substituted by S2129 (SCS/1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback