NJ S2143 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 13 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 13 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes State Transportation Infrastucture Bank and Energy Bank within New Jersey Enviromental Infrastructure Trust.
Title
Establishes State Transportation Infrastucture Bank and Energy Bank within New Jersey Enviromental Infrastructure Trust.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3177 Acs (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3177 Acs (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-21 | Assembly | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (63-14-0) |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted for A3177 (ACS) |
2014-01-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-3) |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment (25-0) (Gordon) |
2013-12-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2012-10-15 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2012-10-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-07-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3177 (Same As) 2014-01-13 - Substituted by S2143 (SCS/1R)