NJ S2151 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A4608

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Converts senior freeze reimbursement into credit applied directly to property tax bills.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Converts senior freeze reimbursement into credit applied directly to property tax bills.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2019-05-13SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-03-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3593 (Same As) 2018-03-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A4608 (Carry Over) 2017-03-20 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback