NJ S2197 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on December 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-20 - Approved P.L.2011, c.145
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on December 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-20 - Approved P.L.2011, c.145
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
"Physician Orders for Life-Sustaining Treatment Act"; provides for use of Physician Orders for Life-Sustaining Treatment forms and requires physicians and advanced practice nurses to pursue continuing education in end-of life care. *
Title
"Physician Orders for Life-Sustaining Treatment Act"; provides for use of Physician Orders for Life-Sustaining Treatment forms and requires physicians and advanced practice nurses to pursue continuing education in end-of life care. *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Emergency Resolution Vote (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-15 - Senate - Senate Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-26 - Senate - Senate Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 9 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-15 - Senate - Senate Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-26 - Senate - Senate Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 9 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-20 | Approved P.L.2011, c.145 | |
2011-12-15 | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (67-0-4) | |
2011-12-15 | Motion Waive Rule 22:5 (Quijano) (67-0-4) | |
2011-12-15 | Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend. | |
2011-12-15 | Passed by the Senate (37-0) | |
2011-09-26 | 2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (37-0) | |
2011-08-25 | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate | |
2011-06-29 | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (60-6-10) | |
2011-06-29 | Substituted for A3475 (ACS) | |
2011-06-29 | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading | |
2011-06-29 | Passed by the Senate (37-0) | |
2011-06-27 | Senate Amendment (23-0) (Ruiz) | |
2011-05-12 | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading | |
2010-07-19 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3475 (Same As) 2011-06-29 - Substituted by S2197 (SCS/1R)