NJ S2214 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S2046
Note: Carry Foward to future A3625
Note: Carry Foward to future A3625
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 8 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-20 - Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 8 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-20 - Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires institutions of higher education and proprietary degree-granting institutions to improve transparency of tuition and fees.
Title
Requires institutions of higher education and proprietary degree-granting institutions to improve transparency of tuition and fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3847 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3847 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend. |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2017-12-07 | Senate | 2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (38-0) |
2017-10-05 | Senate | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0) |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Substituted for A3847 |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2214 (Carry Over) 2017-12-20 - Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend.
S2214 (Carry Over) 2017-12-20 - Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend.
A3847 (Same As) 2017-06-08 - Substituted by S2214
S2214 (Carry Over) 2017-12-20 - Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend.
A3847 (Same As) 2017-06-08 - Substituted by S2214