NJ S2257 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S2218
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - Substituted by A4002 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - Substituted by A4002 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows deduction of promotional gaming credit from gross revenue on sports wagering.
Title
Allows deduction of promotional gaming credit from gross revenue on sports wagering.
Sponsors
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Senate | Substituted by A4002 (1R) |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2257 (Carry Over) 2021-06-03 - Substituted by A4002 (1R)
A4002 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.450.
A4002 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.450.