NJ S2259 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3926
Note: Carry Over of previous S2835
Note: Carry Over of previous S2835
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Substituted by A970 (ACS/2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Substituted by A970 (ACS/2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Mental Health Screening in Schools Grant Program in DOE; appropriates $1 million.
Title
Establishes Mental Health Screening in Schools Grant Program in DOE; appropriates $1 million.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Senate | Substituted by A970 (ACS/2R) |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment (22-0) (Singleton) |
2020-10-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A970 (Same As) 2021-09-28 - Approved P.L.2021, c.237.
A3926 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S2835 (2R)
S2835 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A3926 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S2835 (2R)
S2835 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session