NJ S2261 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S2425

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Revises law relating to common interest communities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises law relating to common interest communities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-02AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
2020-06-29SenatePassed by the Senate (33-2)
2020-05-28SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-03-16SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2425 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A4265 (Same As) 2020-06-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback