NJ S2288 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1016
Note: Carry Foward to future A2070
Note: Carry Over of previous A3397
Note: Carry Foward to future A2070
Note: Carry Over of previous A3397
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-06 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-06 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs DEP to classify neonicotinoid pesticides as restricted use pesticides.
Title
Directs DEP to classify neonicotinoid pesticides as restricted use pesticides.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2288 (Carry Over) 2019-06-06 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S2288 (Carry Over) 2019-06-06 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A3397 (Carry Over) 2016-03-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
A4562 (Same As) 2018-10-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
S2288 (Carry Over) 2019-06-06 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A3397 (Carry Over) 2016-03-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
A4562 (Same As) 2018-10-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee