NJ S2303 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1908
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.403.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.403.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires establishment of Work and Learn Consortiums by certain educational institutions to establish certificate and degree programs identified in high labor-demand industries.
Title
Requires establishment of Work and Learn Consortiums by certain educational institutions to establish certificate and degree programs identified in high labor-demand industries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4843 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.403. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-2) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted for A4843 (2R) |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Sumter) |
2019-12-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-12 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-12-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2303 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.403.
A4843 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S2303 (3R)
A4843 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S2303 (3R)