NJ S2303 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A3395

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Passed on September 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-11 - Approved P.L.2020, c.79.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Concerns subcontracting agreements entered into by public school districts and county colleges.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerns subcontracting agreements entered into by public school districts and county colleges.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4140 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 7 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-11SenateApproved P.L.2020, c.79.
2020-08-27SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-3)
2020-06-30SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2020-06-29AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (65-7-0)
2020-06-29AssemblySubstituted for A4140
2020-06-25AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-06-25AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-03-23AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
2020-03-19SenatePassed by the Senate (32-2)
2020-03-16SenateIntroduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading

Same As/Similar To

S1928 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading
A3395 (Carry Over) 2019-05-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A4140 (Same As) 2020-06-29 - Substituted by S2303 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback