NJ S2307 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-21 - Substituted by A3676 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-21 - Substituted by A3676 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates Garden State Growth Zone at Atlantic City International Airport and surrounding area; adjusts full-time employee designation requirements.*
Title
Creates Garden State Growth Zone at Atlantic City International Airport and surrounding area; adjusts full-time employee designation requirements.*
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Sen. Jeff Van Drew [D] | Sen. Chris Brown [R] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] |
Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] | Sen. James Beach [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-21 | Senate | Substituted by A3676 (2R) |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3676 (Same As) 2018-10-03 - Approved P.L.2018, c.120.