NJ S2323 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S858
Note: Carry Over of previous A4653
Note: Carry Over of previous A4653
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-20 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-20 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires teachers of health and physical education in grades kindergarten through six in public schools to possess appropriate endorsement to instructional certificate.
Title
Requires teachers of health and physical education in grades kindergarten through six in public schools to possess appropriate endorsement to instructional certificate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-12 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-12 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2016-09-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2323 (Carry Over) 2016-10-20 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A2764 (Same As) 2016-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A4653 (Carry Over) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S3067
A2764 (Same As) 2016-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A4653 (Carry Over) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S3067