NJ S2326 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2462
Note: Carry Over of previous S1837
Note: Carry Over of previous S1837
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - Senate Amendment (29-0) (Smith)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - Senate Amendment (29-0) (Smith)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes notification standards regarding automatic renewal of service contracts.
Title
Establishes notification standards regarding automatic renewal of service contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment (29-0) (Smith) |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2326 (Carry Over) 2020-01-09 - Senate Amendment (29-0) (Smith)
A1460 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Passed by the Assembly (73-2-1)
S1837 (Carry Over) 2016-06-16 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A1460 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Passed by the Assembly (73-2-1)
S1837 (Carry Over) 2016-06-16 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading