NJ S2344 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Approved P.L.2020, c.30.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Approved P.L.2020, c.30.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Medicaid and health insurance coverage for certain refills of prescription drugs during state of emergency.
Title
Requires Medicaid and health insurance coverage for certain refills of prescription drugs during state of emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3970 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3970 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | Senate | Approved P.L.2020, c.30. |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-05-14 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) |
2020-05-14 | Assembly | Substituted for A3970 (1R) |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-05-01 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-04-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
2020-04-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2020-04-09 | Senate | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
A3970 (Same As) 2020-05-14 - Substituted by S2344 (1R)