NJ S2353 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1441
Note: Carry Over of previous A3068
Note: Carry Over of previous A3068
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-17 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-17 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises application and issuance procedures for employment certificates for minors.
Title
Revises application and issuance procedures for employment certificates for minors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2353 (Carry Over) 2019-06-17 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3361 (Same As) 2018-02-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
A3068 (Carry Over) 2016-02-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
A3361 (Same As) 2018-02-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
A3068 (Carry Over) 2016-02-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee