NJ S2356 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Passed on May 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Approved P.L.2020, c.31.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Passed on May 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Approved P.L.2020, c.31.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Provides relief to students receiving State financial aid to address special circumstances due to 2020 public health state of emergency.
Title
Provides relief to students receiving State financial aid to address special circumstances due to 2020 public health state of emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3946 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2020, c.31. |
2020-05-14 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (80-0-0) |
2020-05-14 | Assembly | Substituted for A3946 |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-05-01 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-04-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
2020-04-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2020-04-09 | Senate | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
A3946 (Same As) 2020-05-14 - Substituted by S2356