NJ S2371 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A1772

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Permits inclusion of volunteer firefighters and other emergency responders within municipal eligible employee group for purposes of the small employer health benefits plan statutes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits inclusion of volunteer firefighters and other emergency responders within municipal eligible employee group for purposes of the small employer health benefits plan statutes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
2019-06-10SenatePassed by the Senate (36-0)
2019-06-03SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-04-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1487 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A1772 (Carry Over) 2016-09-19 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback