NJ S2397 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4887
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-17 - Approved P.L.2018, c.148.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-17 - Approved P.L.2018, c.148.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires institutions of higher education to provide alternative arrangements to students unable to complete certain assignments by regular due date or register for courses because of day of religious observance.
Title
Requires institutions of higher education to provide alternative arrangements to students unable to complete certain assignments by regular due date or register for courses because of day of religious observance.
Sponsors
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Rep. Gary Schaer [D] | Rep. Robert Karabinchak [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] |
Rep. Patricia Jones [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3440 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-17 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2018, c.148. |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0) |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Substituted for A3440 |
2018-09-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3440 (Same As) 2018-10-29 - Substituted by S2397
A4887 (Carry Over) 2017-06-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A4887 (Carry Over) 2017-06-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee