NJ S2401 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A3057

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Pending: Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires NJEDA to establish loan program for certain farming operation equipment purchases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires NJEDA to establish loan program for certain farming operation equipment purchases.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-07AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
2019-01-31SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2019-01-28SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-01-24SenateRecommitted to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-12-06SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-04-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2535 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
A3057 (Carry Over) 2016-11-21 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Zwicker)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback