NJ S2416 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Substituted by A3683 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes parking privileges for certain healthcare workers who render care at patients' home residences.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes parking privileges for certain healthcare workers who render care at patients' home residences.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01SenateSubstituted by A3683 (2R)
2018-06-11SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-04-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3683 (Same As) 2018-10-04 - Approved P.L.2018, c.124.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback