NJ S2423 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Concerns exemptions from bankruptcy proceedings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerns exemptions from bankruptcy proceedings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-02AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
2020-06-29SenatePassed by the Senate (38-0)
2020-06-25SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-06-22SenateTransferred to Senate Commerce Committee
2020-05-07SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback