NJ S2430 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Substituted by A3945 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends eligibility for accidental disability and accidental death benefits to certain PFRS, SPRS, and PERS members who contract COVID-19 and test positive for SARS-CoV-2.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends eligibility for accidental disability and accidental death benefits to certain PFRS, SPRS, and PERS members who contract COVID-19 and test positive for SARS-CoV-2.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29SenateSubstituted by A3945 (2R)
2020-06-25SenateReported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2020-06-22SenateTransferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2020-05-07SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3945 (Same As) 2020-07-01 - Approved P.L.2020, c.54.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback