NJ S2436 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Approved P.L.2020, c.101.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Approved P.L.2020, c.101.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes pharmacists to order and cause to be administered test for coronavirus disease 2019 (COVID-19 or COVID-19 antibodies; requires health benefits and Medicaid coverage for tests.
Title
Authorizes pharmacists to order and cause to be administered test for coronavirus disease 2019 (COVID-19 or COVID-19 antibodies; requires health benefits and Medicaid coverage for tests.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4012 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4012 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2020, c.101. |
2020-09-24 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (79-0-0) |
2020-09-24 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend. |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2020-08-27 | Senate | 2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (38-0) |
2020-08-13 | Senate | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-0-0) |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Substituted for A4012 (1R) |
2020-06-25 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-25 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4012 (Same As) 2020-06-29 - Substituted by S2436 (1R)