NJ S2439 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Substituted by A3871 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Substituted by A3871 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns disqualification from unemployment benefits for misconduct.*
Title
Concerns disqualification from unemployment benefits for misconduct.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | Senate | Substituted by A3871 (1R) |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3871 (Same As) 2018-08-24 - Approved P.L.2018, c.112.