NJ S244 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S190
Note: Carry Over of previous S1672
Note: Carry Over of previous S1672
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by A790
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by A790
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
"Combat to College Act"; grants priority course registration to military service members and veterans attending public institutions of higher education.
Title
"Combat to College Act"; grants priority course registration to military service members and veterans attending public institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Senate | Substituted by A790 |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S244 (Carry Over) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by A790
S1672 (Carry Over) 2016-06-23 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A790 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.326.
S1672 (Carry Over) 2016-06-23 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A790 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.326.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/S244 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/S0500/244_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S244 |