NJ S2447 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on August 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-05 - Approved P.L.2019, c.206.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Requires landlords to count federal military service member and veteran housing allowances as income for purposes of qualifying for rental housing; designated as Securing Electronic Records for Veterans Ease Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires landlords to count federal military service member and veteran housing allowances as income for purposes of qualifying for rental housing; designated as Securing Electronic Records for Veterans Ease Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3841 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-05AssemblyApproved P.L.2019, c.206.
2019-06-20AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0)
2019-06-20AssemblySubstituted for A3841
2019-06-10AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-07-30AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
2018-07-01SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2018-05-14SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-04-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3841 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S2447

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback