NJ S2463 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-30 - Substituted by A3965 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-30 - Substituted by A3965 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands existing EDA loan program to include certain small producers and retailers of alcoholic beverages.
Title
Expands existing EDA loan program to include certain small producers and retailers of alcoholic beverages.
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] | Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-30 | Senate | Substituted by A3965 (1R) |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3965 (Same As) 2020-09-14 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly