NJ S2483 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1639
Note: Carry Foward to future A3387
Note: Carry Over of previous A1502
Note: Carry Foward to future A3387
Note: Carry Over of previous A1502
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-17 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-17 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"New Jersey Transit Villages Act."
Title
"New Jersey Transit Villages Act."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2483 (Carry Over) 2019-06-17 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2483 (Carry Over) 2019-06-17 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2926 (Same As) 2018-09-13 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A1502 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S2483 (Carry Over) 2019-06-17 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2926 (Same As) 2018-09-13 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A1502 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee