NJ S2489 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A3655

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Approved P.L.2019, c.178.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Requires board of education to post information about child abuse hotline in each school.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires board of education to post information about child abuse hotline in each school.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A425 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-19AssemblyApproved P.L.2019, c.178.
2019-05-23AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0)
2019-05-23AssemblySubstituted for A425
2018-06-21AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2018-06-21SenatePassed by the Senate (40-0)
2018-06-14SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-04-16SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A425 (Same As) 2019-05-23 - Substituted by S2489
A3655 (Carry Over) 2017-12-20 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback