NJ S2498 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Approved P.L.2020, c.48.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Approved P.L.2020, c.48.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes NJ Infrastructure Bank to expend certain sums to make loans for environmental infrastructure projects for FY2021.
Title
Authorizes NJ Infrastructure Bank to expend certain sums to make loans for environmental infrastructure projects for FY2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4298 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2020, c.48. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-0-0) |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Substituted for A4298 |
2020-06-25 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-25 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4298 (Same As) 2020-06-29 - Substituted by S2498